TX SB118 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of the expiration date of the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.
Title
Relating to the extension of the expiration date of the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB360 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB118 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00118I.htm |