TX SB1178 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the rights and duties of parents and the protection of parental rights in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the rights and duties of parents and the protection of parental rights in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3231 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback