TX SB1173 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to evaluation of public school performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to evaluation of public school performance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-20HouseRead first time
2017-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-16SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-03-01SenateFiled
2017-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback