TX SB117 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development and implementation of the Live Well Texas program to provide health benefit coverage to certain individuals; imposing penalties.
Title
Relating to the development and implementation of the Live Well Texas program to provide health benefit coverage to certain individuals; imposing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3871 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB117 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00117I.htm |