TX SB1169 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suicide prevention training for educators in public schools.
Title
Relating to suicide prevention training for educators in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUICIDE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUICIDE