TX SB1169 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to water conservation.
Title
Relating to water conservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - SB 1169Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - SB 1169Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - SB 1169Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-20 | House | Amended |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
DROUGHT
Financial
Financial--General
Political Subdivisions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset
Sunset--Recommended Reviews
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
City Government--Utilities
DROUGHT
Financial
Financial--General
Political Subdivisions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset
Sunset--Recommended Reviews
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General