TX SB1168 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of certain property owners' associations, condominium unit owners' associations, and councils of owners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of certain property owners' associations, condominium unit owners' associations, and councils of owners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-24 - House - SB 1168Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Simpson (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-28SenateRecord vote
2015-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-28SenateRead
2015-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-24HouseRecord vote
2015-05-24HousePassed as amended
2015-05-24HouseAmended
2015-05-24HouseRecord vote
2015-05-24HouseAmended
2015-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseMotion to table fails
2015-05-23HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-23HouseAmended
2015-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-20HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2015-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-12HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2015-05-12HouseRead first time
2015-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-05-06SenateReported engrossed
2015-05-06SenateRemarks ordered printed
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenatePassed
2015-05-06SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-06SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-06SenateAmended
2015-05-06SenateLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-06SenatePostponed
2015-05-06SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-06SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-17SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-03-17SenateRead first time
2015-03-10SenateFiled
2015-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback