TX SB1168 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to a rescission period for annuity contracts.
Title
Relating to a rescission period for annuity contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Rep. John Smithee [R] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time | |
2009-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Passed | |
2009-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2652 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee