TX SB1165 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appointment and terms of the board of the hospital managers of the Dallas County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appointment and terms of the board of the hospital managers of the Dallas County Hospital District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective immediately
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1299
2021-05-23HousePassed
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-05-04HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1165
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01165I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01165S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01165E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01165H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01165F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01165I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01165I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01165S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01165S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01165H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01165F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1165&RcdVtNo=1299&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback