TX SB1165 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the express preemption of regulation of oil and gas operations and the exclusive jurisdiction of those operations by the state.
Title
Relating to the express preemption of regulation of oil and gas operations and the exclusive jurisdiction of those operations by the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Companion document considered in lieu of |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Common Carriers
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas