TX SB1165 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of real property by the University of Houston--Sugar Land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of real property by the University of Houston--Sugar Land.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-10 Effective immediately
2013-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-01HouseSigned in the House
2013-04-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-04-30SenateReported enrolled
2013-04-29SenateHouse passage reported
2013-04-25HouseRecord vote
2013-04-25HousePassed
2013-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-25HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2013-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-15HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2013-04-15HouseRead first time
2013-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenatePassed
2013-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Transportation
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-03-05SenateFiled
2013-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback