TX SB1163 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-02-28SenateFiled
2017-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback