TX SB116 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to industrial hemp; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to industrial hemp; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB989 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB116 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00116I.htm |