TX SB1136 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Left pending in committee

Summary

Relating to the designation by the commissioner of the General Land Office of critical coastal erosion areas for purposes of the coastal erosion response plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation by the commissioner of the General Land Office of critical coastal erosion areas for purposes of the coastal erosion response plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-09 Left pending in committee
2009-04-09 Testimony taken in committee
2009-04-09 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-09 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-13 Referred to Natural Resources
2009-03-13 Read first time
2009-02-25 Filed
2009-02-25 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2074 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Effective on 9/1/09

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback