TX SB1135 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of public transit vehicles equipped with connected braking systems.
Title
Relating to the operation of public transit vehicles equipped with connected braking systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2219 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1135 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01135I.htm |