TX SB1134 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to address confidentiality on certain documents for certain federal officials and family members of certain federal officials or federal or state court judges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to address confidentiality on certain documents for certain federal officials and family members of certain federal officials or federal or state court judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-08HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4347 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1134
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01134I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01134S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01134E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01134H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01134F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01134I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01134I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01134E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01134H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01134F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1134&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback