TX SB1134 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the authority for certain high school students to serve as election clerks.
Title
Relating to the authority for certain high school students to serve as election clerks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Filed | |
2009-02-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB252 (Similar To) 2009-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Minors
Minors--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Minors
Minors--General