TX SB1133 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting public schools from owning, leasing, or having a business interest in certain entities and real property associated with those entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting public schools from owning, leasing, or having a business interest in certain entities and real property associated with those entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-26SenateFiled
2019-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4131 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback