TX SB1132 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers; authorizing the change of a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers; authorizing the change of a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1299 |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3123 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions