TX SB1126 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment and administration of the Texas Woman's University System.
Title
Relating to the establishment and administration of the Texas Woman's University System.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#890 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#890 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-13 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#890 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Stucky |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2705 |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Seliger |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2705 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY AT DALLAS
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY AT HOUSTON
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY AT DALLAS
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY AT HOUSTON
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY SYSTEM