TX SB1125 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of certain controlled substance property and plants seized by or forfeited to a law enforcement agency.
Title
Relating to the disposition of certain controlled substance property and plants seized by or forfeited to a law enforcement agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1500 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |