TX SB1125 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to energy efficiency goals and programs, public information regarding energy efficiency programs, and the participation of loads in certain energy markets.
Title
Relating to energy efficiency goals and programs, public information regarding energy efficiency programs, and the participation of loads in certain energy markets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-10 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Amended | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-10 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-03 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |