TX SB1122 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a sanitarian recruitment and retention program in border counties for public health purposes.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a sanitarian recruitment and retention program in border counties for public health purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL SANITATION & SANITARIANS
Health
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL SANITATION & SANITARIANS
Health
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF