TX SB1121 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public health laboratory capabilities in certain counties.
Title
Relating to public health laboratory capabilities in certain counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
CAMERON COUNTY
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIDALGO COUNTY
MAVERICK COUNTY
STARR COUNTY
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VAL VERDE COUNTY
WEBB COUNTY
WILLACY COUNTY
ZAPATA COUNTY
CAMERON COUNTY
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIDALGO COUNTY
MAVERICK COUNTY
STARR COUNTY
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VAL VERDE COUNTY
WEBB COUNTY
WILLACY COUNTY
ZAPATA COUNTY