TX SB1120 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health professional continuing education to address communicable and other diseases in border counties.
Title
Relating to health professional continuing education to address communicable and other diseases in border counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF