TX SB112 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedures for the installation and use of tracking equipment and for access to certain communications and location information by law enforcement and the admissibility of certain evidence obtained through those procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedures for the installation and use of tracking equipment and for access to certain communications and location information by law enforcement and the admissibility of certain evidence obtained through those procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1460 (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1418 (Y: 60 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1460
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1418
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Dominguez
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-05-04HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-27SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB356 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB112
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00112I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00112S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00112E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00112H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00112F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00112H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00112I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00112I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00112E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00112H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00112H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00112F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB112&RcdVtNo=1418&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB112&RcdVtNo=1460&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=100

Bill Comments

feedback