TX SB1116 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to insurance premium tax credits for the construction or rehabilitation of a supportive housing property.
Title
Relating to insurance premium tax credits for the construction or rehabilitation of a supportive housing property.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION, TEXAS STATE
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1116 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01116I.htm |