TX SB1114 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to verification of the citizenship status of certain registered voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to verification of the citizenship status of certain registered voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-15HouseRead first time
2021-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed
2021-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateAmended
2021-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateTagged
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-05SenateFiled
2021-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1114
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01114I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01114S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01114E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01114S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01114I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01114I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01114S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01114S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01114E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments 750

feedback