TX SB1113 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a registrar's failure to approve, change, or cancel voter registrations under applicable law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a registrar's failure to approve, change, or cancel voter registrations under applicable law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1367 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1333 (Y: 64 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1367
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-23HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2021-05-23HouseAmended 2-Bucy
2021-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1333
2021-05-23HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-C. Turner
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed
2021-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateAmended
2021-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateTagged
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-05SenateFiled
2021-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4044 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4044 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1113
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01113I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01113S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01113E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01113H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01113F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01113S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01113H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01113H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01113I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01113I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01113E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01113H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01113F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01113F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1113&RcdVtNo=1333&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1113&RcdVtNo=1367&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=73

Bill Comments

feedback