TX SB1111 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the residence address of a voter for purposes of a response to a confirmation notice sent by the voter registrar.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the residence address of a voter for purposes of a response to a confirmation notice sent by the voter registrar.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1451 (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1450 (Y: 63 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1417 (Y: 67 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1416 (Y: 68 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1451
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Israel
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1450
2021-05-25HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Bucy
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-J. González
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Meza
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1417
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Bucy
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1416
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Bucy
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Elections
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-27SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-27SenateLaid out as postponed business
2021-04-27SenatePostponed 4/27/21 1:00 PM
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateAmended
2021-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-05SenateFiled
2021-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3974 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1111
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01111I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01111S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01111E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01111H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01111F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01111H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01111I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01111I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01111E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01111H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01111F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1111&RcdVtNo=1416&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1111&RcdVtNo=1417&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1111&RcdVtNo=1450&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1111&RcdVtNo=1451&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback