TX SB1109 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring public schools to provide instruction and materials and adopt policies relating to the prevention of child abuse, family violence, and dating violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring public schools to provide instruction and materials and adopt policies relating to the prevention of child abuse, family violence, and dating violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Anchia
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HouseObjections withdrawn
2021-05-26HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-05HouseRead first time
2021-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenatePassed
2021-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-28SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-05SenateFiled
2021-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1109
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01109I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01109S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01109E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01109H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01109F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01109H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01109I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01109I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01109H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01109F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01109F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1109&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=91

Bill Comments

feedback