TX SB1109 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of the general election for officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of the general election for officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1109 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-28SenateRead
2017-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Elections
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-02-27SenateFiled
2017-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1109
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01109I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01109S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01109E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01109H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01109F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1109&RcdVtNo=1804&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1109&RcdVtNo=1814&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback