TX SB1107 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.
Title
Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1143 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1143 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health Care Providers
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
TELEMEDICINE
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
TELEMEDICINE