TX SB1107 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the vaccination against bacterial meningitis of entering students at public and private or independent institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the vaccination against bacterial meningitis of entering students at public and private or independent institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-16 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-16 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-11 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-11 | Read | |
2011-05-11 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-06 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-05 | Amended | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-05-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Amended | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-13 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-06 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
IMMUNIZATIONS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
IMMUNIZATIONS