TX SB1105 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and operation of Medicaid, including Medicaid managed care.
Title
Relating to the administration and operation of Medicaid, including Medicaid managed care.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] |
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1672 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1672 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Phelan |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 14-S. Thompson |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 13-Price |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 12-Miller |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 11-Oliverson |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 10-Coleman, S. Thompson, and Rose |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 9-Sheffield |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 8-Sheffield |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 7-Ortega |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 6-Cortez |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 5-Shaheen |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 4-Raymond |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 3-Raymond |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Raymond |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Frank |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INTERNET
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INTERNET
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID