TX SB11 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to general procedures and requirements for certain do-not-resuscitate orders; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to general procedures and requirements for certain do-not-resuscitate orders; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-15 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#159 (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2017-08-16 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-15SenateReported enrolled
2017-08-15HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-08-15SenateRead
2017-08-15SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-08-13SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-08-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-13HouseRecord vote
2017-08-13HousePassed
2017-08-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-12HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-08-12HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-08-12HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-10HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-08-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-02HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-08-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-08-01HouseRead first time
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-26SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed
2017-07-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-25SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-07-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateRecord vote
2017-07-20SenateRules suspended
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order overruled
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-12SenateFiled
2017-07-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB11
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00011I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00011S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00011E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00011H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00011F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-20-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=51
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=52
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=53
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB11&RcdVtNo=159&Ch=H&Dt=08/13/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F1.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback