TX SB1099 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the selection and administration of an appraisal review board in certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the selection and administration of an appraisal review board in certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3322 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Elections--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts