TX SB1099 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1142 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General
County Government--Finance
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1099 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01099I.htm |