TX SB1097 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of certain municipal hospital authorities under a contract for the sale of a hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of certain municipal hospital authorities under a contract for the sale of a hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23 Effective immediately
2023-05-23 Filed without the Governor's signature
2023-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2023-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2023-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1308
2023-05-09HousePassed
2023-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-09HousePassed to 3rd reading
2023-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-21HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2023-04-21HouseRead first time
2023-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2023-04-20SenateRecord vote
2023-04-20SenatePassed
2023-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-20SenateRecord vote
2023-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2023-04-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-13SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2023-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-06SenateVote taken in committee
2023-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-03-09SenateRead first time
2023-02-22SenateFiled
2023-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2573 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
HB2573 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB1097
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01097I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01097S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01097E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01097H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01097F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01097I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01097I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01097S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01097S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01097H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01097F.htm
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ04-20-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB1097&RcdVtNo=1308&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2023

Bill Comments

feedback