TX SB1097 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to retainage requirements for certain public works construction projects.
Title
Relating to retainage requirements for certain public works construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-30 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB692 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State