TX SB1095 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of used automotive parts recyclers; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of used automotive parts recyclers; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
TEXAS USED AUTOMOTIVE PARTS RECYCLING ACT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
TEXAS USED AUTOMOTIVE PARTS RECYCLING ACT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment