TX SB1093 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of a veterans treatment court program.
Title
Relating to the administration of a veterans treatment court program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-18 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security