TX SB1090 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Point of order sustained |
2017-05-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Animals
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
RESTRAINTS
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
RESTRAINTS