TX SB1088 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of cosmetology.
Title
Relating to the regulation of cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COSMETOLOGISTS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions