TX SB1084 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Preparation for Adult Living Program and other services for foster children transitioning to independent living.
Title
Relating to the Preparation for Adult Living Program and other services for foster children transitioning to independent living.
Sponsors
Sen. Beverly Powell [D] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-05-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2632 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS
Housing
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS
Housing
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety