TX SB1070 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorized reinsurance and financial statement credit and accounting for reinsurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorized reinsurance and financial statement credit and accounting for reinsurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1020 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate discharges conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateSenate discharges conferees
2017-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-21SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-19HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-19HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-11HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-11HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-11HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-11SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-11SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-11SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-11SenateRead
2017-05-11SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-08SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-06HouseAmended
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-02-23SenateFiled
2017-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1070
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01070I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01070S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01070E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01070H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01070F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1070&RcdVtNo=1020&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=91

Bill Comments

feedback