TX SB1061 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the commissioner of education regarding granting additional charters for open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the commissioner of education regarding granting additional charters for open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools