TX SB106 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to court jurisdiction and procedures relating to truancy; providing criminal penalties; imposing a court cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to court jurisdiction and procedures relating to truancy; providing criminal penalties; imposing a court cost.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2015-05-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-29HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2015-04-29HouseRead first time
2015-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-15SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-15SenateRemarks ordered printed
2015-04-15SenateRecord vote
2015-04-15SenatePassed
2015-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-15SenateRecord vote
2015-04-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-15SenateRecord vote
2015-04-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-15SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2015-04-15SenateRecord vote
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment tabled
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2015-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-15SenateAmendment amended
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2015-04-15SenateLaid out as postponed business
2015-04-15SenatePostponed
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2015-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-15SenateAmendment amended
2015-04-15SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2015-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-15SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-15SenateRecord vote
2015-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-25SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-18SenateCo-author authorized
2015-01-27SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-01-27SenateRead first time
2014-11-10SenateFiled
2014-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback