TX SB1055 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to motor vehicle accidents involving a vulnerable road user within the area of a crosswalk and to requiring the operator of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle accidents involving a vulnerable road user within the area of a crosswalk and to requiring the operator of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1194 (Y: 70 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1194
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-Canales
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-13HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 2081
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-04SenateFiled
2021-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2081 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1055
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01055I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01055S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01055E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01055H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01055F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01055H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01055I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01055I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01055E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01055H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01055F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01055F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1055&RcdVtNo=1194&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=69
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=8

Bill Comments

feedback