TX SB1049 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from the franchise tax and certain filing fees for certain businesses owned by veterans during an initial period of operation in the state.
Title
Relating to an exemption from the franchise tax and certain filing fees for certain businesses owned by veterans during an initial period of operation in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - SB 1049Third Reading House (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-25 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS